Global patent index - EP 0960238 B1

EP 0960238 B1 2001-04-11 - CONNECTING DEVICE FOR THE SHAFT OR GUIDING BAR OF A VIBRATING PLATE

Title (en)

CONNECTING DEVICE FOR THE SHAFT OR GUIDING BAR OF A VIBRATING PLATE

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE DEICHSEL ODER DEN FÜHRUNGSBÜGEL EINER VIBRATIONSPLATTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT POUR LE TIMON OU L'ETRIER DE GUIDAGE D'UNE PLAQUE AGISSANT PAR VIBRATIONS

Publication

EP 0960238 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98903003 A

Priority

  • DE 29701737 U
  • EP 9800165 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6213673B1] A connecting device enabling spring-suspended connection of a shaft or a guiding bar (3) to a hand-operated vibrating plate which has two pairs arranged at a fixed distance from each other in the direction of a vertical pivotal axis (8), each pair has a first connecting element in the form of a rubber buffer (5) and a second connecting element in the form of a ring (4a) surrounding the rubber buffer (5) substantially free of play and sliding coaxially in relation to the pivotal axis (8). One connecting element (5) of each pair (4a, 5) is fastened to the upper section (1a) and the other connecting element (4a) is fastened to the shaft of guiding bar (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/35; E02D 3/046

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/35 (2006.01); B06B 3/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01); E01C 19/38 (2006.01); F16C 11/10 (2006.01); F16F 7/00 (2006.01); F16F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/006 (2013.01); E01C 19/38 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32614 (2013.01); Y10T 403/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29701737 U1 19970403; EP 0960238 A1 19991201; EP 0960238 B1 20010411; JP 2001509731 A 20010724; JP 3786710 B2 20060614; US 6213673 B1 20010410; WO 9833983 A1 19980806

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150114

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59800624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG TRANSFER- WACKER CONSTR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800624

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000615

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981002

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE