Global Patent Index - EP 0960264 B1

EP 0960264 B1 2001-03-21 - HEWING OR CUTTING ROLLER WITH VARIABLE CUTTING WIDTH

Title (en)

HEWING OR CUTTING ROLLER WITH VARIABLE CUTTING WIDTH

Title (de)

SCHRÄM- ODER SCHNEIDWALZE MIT VERÄNDERBARER SCHNEIDBREITE

Title (fr)

TAMBOUR DE HAVAGE OU DE COUPE A LARGEUR DE COUPE VARIABLE

Publication

EP 0960264 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98901237 A

Priority

  • AT 9800017 W
  • AT 14597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834010A1] The invention concerns a hewing or cutting roller (1) with variable cutting width, wherein two pivotable cutting or hewing tool carriers (4, 5) are disposed on at least one lateral end face (2) of the hewing or cutting roller (1), transversely to the axis thereof. One of the tool carriers bears a locking bolt (10) which, in the extended position of the tool carriers (4, 5), co-operates with a hook-shaped locking member on the other tool carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 25/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 25/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 25/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834010 A1 19980806; AT 199961 T 20010415; AT 405318 B 19990726; AT A14597 A 19981115; AU 5740498 A 19980825; AU 733961 B2 20010531; DE 59800562 D1 20010426; EP 0960264 A1 19991201; EP 0960264 B1 20010321; US 6244664 B1 20010612; ZA 9710828 B 19980623

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800562 20010426

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199961 T 20010415

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOEST-ALPINE BERGTECHNIK GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB