Global Patent Index - EP 0960272 A4

EP 0960272 A4 2000-04-05 - FUEL LINE ENHANCER

Title (en)

FUEL LINE ENHANCER

Title (de)

VERSTÄRKER FÜR BRENNSTOFFLEITUNG

Title (fr)

ACTIVATEUR POUR CONDUITE DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0960272 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98901691 A

Priority

  • US 9800116 W
  • US 3500697 P
  • US 84267697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832816A2] A device for pre-conditioning fuel before it enters either an internal conbustion chamber or a furnace employs appropiate arrangements of magnets and a heat exchanger. The in-line fuel conditioning apparatus comprises a cylindrical fuel impervious container and a temperature control flow line that passes through the cylinder. While passing through the container, the fuel contacts a magnetic field generated by a series of magnets (preferably an even number of pairs) arranged so that pole pieces having the same polarity (i.e., N or S) face each other, while adjacent pole pieces have opposite polarities. A gap separates the poles pieces of each pair and the fuel flows through this gap. Alternative embodiments are concerned with different configurations for bringing together the fuel, the magnets and the coolant during the transport of the fuel to the combustion region. For the pre-treatment of fuel for an internal combustion engine, a source of coolant is used to lower the temperature of the fuel contacting the magnetic field generated by the magnets. For the pre-treatment of heating oil being delivered to a furnace a greater efficiency of burning occurs when a temperature control flow line, such as a copper hot water tube wrapped around the container, is used to raise, rather than lower the temperature of the fuel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 53/00 (2006.01); C10G 32/02 (2006.01); C10L 1/00 (2006.01); F02M 53/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 32/02 (2013.01); C10L 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832816 A2 19980730; WO 9832816 A3 19981112; AU 5815098 A 19980818; AU 735379 B2 20010705; BR 9807105 A 20001003; EP 0960272 A2 19991201; EP 0960272 A4 20000405; IL 130828 D0 20010128; JP 2000517021 A 20001219; TR 199901562 T2 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024042

2003-02-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2000-04-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 53/00 A

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE