Global Patent Index - EP 0960308 B1

EP 0960308 B1 2001-12-05 - GAS TURBINE INSTALLATION WITH A CERAMIC-COVERED COMBUSTION CHAMBER HOUSING

Title (en)

GAS TURBINE INSTALLATION WITH A CERAMIC-COVERED COMBUSTION CHAMBER HOUSING

Title (de)

GASTURBINENANLAGE MIT EINEM MIT KERAMIKSTEINEN AUSGEKLEIDETEN BRENNKAMMERGEHÄUSE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE TURBINE A GAZ COMPORTANT UNE ENVELOPPE DE CHAMBRE A COMBUSTION A REVETEMENT DE BRIQUES DE CERAMIQUE

Publication

EP 0960308 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98909340 A

Priority

  • DE 9800324 W
  • DE 19704976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19704976A1] The invention relates to a gas turbine installation whose combustion chamber housing (7) located between the compressor and the turbine is fitted with solid ceramic material (10) and whose rotor (2) and covering housing sections (1) are provided with blades (3, 4, 5, 6). On the side of the turbine, at least the first rows of blades (3, 5) support ceramic heat-insulating layers. According to the invention, the ceramic material (10) is provided on its surface with a coating (12, 13) which prevents the ceramic surfaces from being "sanded down" thereby avoiding the related destruction of the heat insulating layers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; C23C 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/42 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); F01D 5/28 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F02C 7/24 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/288 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19704976 A1 19980730; DE 19704976 C2 19990225; EP 0960308 A1 19991201; EP 0960308 B1 20011205; JP 2001509874 A 20010724; JP 4294736 B2 20090715; RU 2178530 C2 20020120; WO 9834068 A1 19980806

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180128

2018-02-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180128

2018-01-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802328

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802328 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI