Global Patent Index - EP 0960357 B1

EP 0960357 B1 2002-11-06 - DEVELOPING STATION WITH CROSS CONVEYANCE

Title (en)

DEVELOPING STATION WITH CROSS CONVEYANCE

Title (de)

ENTWICKLERSTATION MIT QUERFÖRDERUNG

Title (fr)

POSTE DE DEVELOPPEMENT A AMENEE TRANSVERSALE

Publication

EP 0960357 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912227 A

Priority

  • DE 9800431 W
  • DE 19705375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836328A1] The invention relates to a developing station, wherein toner is conveyed across the advance direction of a given base material, across the entire print span (B) on a conveyor line by means of a cross conveying device (10), and discharged in doses onto the base material by means of a dosing device (8). The cross conveying device (10) is designed in such a way that the cross conveying speed of the conveying line is continuously reduced and/or the proportions of the quantity of toner conveyed in the cross direction per unit of time and the dosed quantity of toner discharge per unit of time can be adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0891 (2013.01); G03G 15/0877 (2013.01); Y10S 222/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836328 A1 19980820; DE 19880139 D2 20000316; EP 0960357 A1 19991201; EP 0960357 B1 20021106; US 6208823 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806187

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090212

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806187 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB