Global Patent Index - EP 0960592 A3

EP 0960592 A3 2000-11-08 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Cloison de douche

Publication

EP 0960592 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110104 A

Priority

  • DE 19823307 A
  • DE 19842915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960592A2] The fixed partition elements (7,9,10) each have a wider arm (7a,9a,10a) and a narrower arm (7b,9b,10b) connected at an angle. The wider arms are fixable on the room walls (1,2) and cover these from the shower area. A swivel door element (12,13) is hung from the free end of the narrower arm of at least one partition. The door element can be curved or angled by an obtuse angle of about 135 degrees. The narrower arm and wider arm of the fixed partition elements are connected together integral.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960592 A2 19991201; EP 0960592 A3 20001108; EP 0960592 B1 20080820; AT 405202 T 20080915; DE 19842915 A1 19991202; DE 59914837 D1 20081002; ES 2312196 T3 20090216

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HUEPPE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR, SPEISER & PARTNER, DE

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090525

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HUPPE G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080820

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2312196

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2008-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914837

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-23 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2008-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A47K 3/36 20060101AFI20080129BHEP

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030506

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47K 3/22 A, 7A 47K 3/36 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI