Global patent index - EP 0960613 A3

EP 0960613 A3 2000-04-12 - Vehicle for invalids

Title (en)

Vehicle for invalids

Title (de)

Fahrzeug für Behinderte

Title (fr)

Véhicule pour invalides

Publication

EP 0960613 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810446 A

Priority

CH 114498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960613A2] The vehicle has a seat (20) which is held adjustable at the chassis, using an adjusting drive (26). The drive adjusts the seat depending on the position of the chassis or the seat determined by a sensor unit (27), deviating from a horizontal position. Thus, when negotiating an incline, the overall point of gravity of the vehicle and the user is automatically adjusted in the direction of the sloping surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/04 (2013.01); A61G 5/06 (2006.01); A61G 5/12 (2006.01); A61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2013.01); A61G 5/042 (2013.01); A61G 5/1051 (2016.11); A61G 5/1067 (2013.01); A61G 5/107 (2013.01); A61G 5/1075 (2013.01); A61G 2203/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960613 A2 19991201; EP 0960613 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI