Global patent index - EP 0960616 A3

EP 0960616 A3 2000-04-26 - Multiple use universal stopper

Title (en)

Multiple use universal stopper

Title (de)

Universeller Mehrzweckstopfen

Title (fr)

Bouchon universel à utilisations multiples

Publication

EP 0960616 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99103563 A

Priority

US 8009198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960616A2] A multiple use universal closure assembly designed for use in various containers (10) having receiving means for assessing to the content of the container (10). The multiple use universal closure assembly comprising an elastomeric membrane capable of being ruptured by an external access means such as a luer connector or a syringe having a sharp or blunt cannula or a sharp or blunt spike for fluid communication between the content of the container (10) and the access means. The elastomeric membrane reseals itself after being ruptured by an external access means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/14 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01); B65D 39/04 (2006.01); B65D 47/06 (2006.01); B65D 51/00 (2006.01); B65D 51/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2096 (2013.01); A61J 1/1406 (2013.01); A61J 1/1425 (2015.05); A61J 1/1481 (2015.05); A61J 1/1487 (2015.05); B65D 51/002 (2013.01); A61J 1/1468 (2015.05); A61J 1/2044 (2015.05); A61J 1/2055 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960616 A2 19991201; EP 0960616 A3 20000426; EP 0960616 B1 20040908; CA 2262477 A1 19991116; CA 2262477 C 20080212; DE 69919935 D1 20041014; DE 69919935 T2 20050915; JP 4288742 B2 20090701; JP H11321916 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919935

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI