Global Patent Index - EP 0960659 B1

EP 0960659 B1 2000-08-23 - Travel control device for vibrating plate compactor

Title (en)

Travel control device for vibrating plate compactor

Title (de)

Bewegungssteuerung für einen Verdichter mit Vibrationsplatte

Title (fr)

Système de commande pour le déplacement d'un compacteur à plaque vibrante

Publication

EP 0960659 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99108350 A

Priority

JP 14666398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960659A1] The invention refers to a travel control device (20, 50) for a vibrating plate compactor. The vibrating plate compactor comprises two shafts (3, 4) supporting each an eccentric rotor (5, 6). The phase difference between the eccentric rotors (5, 6) is controlled by the travel control device (20, 50). The travel control device (20, 50) comprises a piston (29, 66) in a body (21, 51) to receive mechanical return force from a vibration generator (1) in the vibrating plate compactor. The piston (29, 66) receives pressure oil from an outside hydraulic pump (41, 55) at the other end. A push rod (22, 52) for switching the travel direction of the compactor is inserted into the body (21, 51) at one end. A spool (24, 59) is provided to supply the pressure oil from the hydraulic pump (41, 55) to the side of the piston (29, 66) opposite to the side receiving the mechanical return force. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/16; E02D 3/074

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/22 (2006.01); B06B 1/16 (2006.01); E01C 19/34 (2006.01); E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E02D 3/074 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/166 (2013.01); E01C 19/38 (2013.01); E02D 3/074 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960659 A1 19991201; EP 0960659 B1 20000823; DE 69900009 D1 20000928; DE 69900009 T2 20010405; ES 2151766 T3 20010101; JP 3318528 B2 20020826; JP H11323817 A 19991126

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050429

2006-04-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2004-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151766 T3

2000-11-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900009 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000309

1999-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI