Global Patent Index - EP 0960662 A3

EP 0960662 A3 2002-11-27 - Method of determining the roll force

Title (en)

Method of determining the roll force

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Walzkraft

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer la force de laminage

Publication

EP 0960662 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107486 A

Priority

DE 19823986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960662A2] In determining the rolling force (Fw) depending on a friction coefficient ((x)) , where x = 0 - ld, variable over the roll gap length (ld) between the roll (2) and rolled stock (1), a function of the friction coefficient (f(x) over the roll gap length (ld) depending on a vertical voltage (y = f1(x), an average flow voltage kf = kfm, a rolling angle ( = f2(x), and a correction factor, the influence of lubricants and geometric roll gap ratios is determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 38/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 38/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] BERNHARDT R: "NEUES REIBUNGSMODELL FÜR DAS FLACHWALZEN UND ERSTE BETRIEBSERFAHRUNGEN", STAHL UND EISEN, VERLAG STAHLEISEN GMBH. DÜSSELDORF, DE, vol. 118, no. 1, 20 January 1998 (1998-01-20), pages 35 - 37, XP000734830, ISSN: 0340-4803

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960662 A2 19991201; EP 0960662 A3 20021127; EP 0960662 B1 20041013; DE 19823986 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910799

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120429

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120429

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CONVERTEAM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-28 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: CONVERTEAM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090211

2008-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: APC POWER CONVERSION GMBH

- Effective date: 20080709

2008-10-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CONVERTEAM GMBH

2008-07-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-07-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-02-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910799 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER CONVERSION GMBH

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI