Global Patent Index - EP 0960720 A3

EP 0960720 A3 2001-12-05 - Color slide fastener and method and apparatus for fabricating the same

Title (en)

Color slide fastener and method and apparatus for fabricating the same

Title (de)

Gefärbter Reissverschluss und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Fermeture à glissière colorée et procédé et dispositif pour sa fabriction

Publication

EP 0960720 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108973 A

Priority

  • KR 19980016328 A
  • KR 19980007326 U
  • KR 19980037001 A
  • KR 19980037002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960720A2] A color slide fastener and a method and apparatus for fabricating the same are disclosed, The method includes the steps of a tape arranging step for arranging a support tape of a slide fastener on a mold having a capacity having a plurality of unit fastening element molding material grooves for molding a plurality of unit fastening elements, a molding material heating and discharge step for separating a molding material of more than two colors from a source material supply unit by the colors by a molding material injection means and then heating and discharging the same, a moving step for grouping external molding material flow paths from the molding material supply unit to an injection port of the mold into more than two groups and then moving different colors molding material by the colors, an injection step for injecting the molding material into the unit fastening element molding material groove through a plurality of injection ports formed in the mold, and a cooling and extracting step for cooling and extracting the unit fastening element engaged with the support tape, for thereby easily injection-molding a unit fastening element (tooth of fastener) of a slide fastener in more than two colors for thereby diverging the design of various clothes and portable things and enlarging a design choice. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 5/02; B29C 45/00; B29C 45/14; B29C 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/40 (2006.01); A44B 19/42 (2006.01); B29C 45/14 (2006.01); B29C 45/16 (2006.01); B29D 5/00 (2006.01); B29D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/14573 (2013.01); B29D 5/02 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0021 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2536 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2539 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2561 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49785 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960720 A2 19991201; EP 0960720 A3 20011205; CN 1234997 A 19991117; JP 3099018 B2 20001016; JP H11320698 A 19991124; TW 379170 B 20000111; US 2001007165 A1 20010712; US 2001007376 A1 20010712; US 6279209 B1 20010828; US 6422851 B2 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026395

2004-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 29D 5/02 A, 7B 29C 45/00 B, 7B 29C 45/14 B, 7B 29C 45/16 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI