Global Patent Index - EP 0960735 A3

EP 0960735 A3 2000-04-26 - Cleaning device and method for inkjet printing head

Title (en)

Cleaning device and method for inkjet printing head

Title (de)

Reinigungsgerät und Reinigungsverfahren für Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode de netoyage pour tête d'impression à jets d'encre

Publication

EP 0960735 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99110177 A

Priority

  • JP 14637098 A
  • JP 31145398 A
  • JP 25440998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960735A2] The present invention provides a cleaning device for an inkjet printing head and a method for cleaning such a head; a wiper to be used for cleaning the inkjet printing head; and an inkjet printing apparatus having such a wiper for preventing the deposition of ink on the side of a printing head. Slits (3a, 3b) facing to the side (1a, b) of the printing head are formed on a wiper (3) made of a sheet of rubber, which moves relatively with the printing head. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16538 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960735 A2 19991201; EP 0960735 A3 20000426; EP 0960735 B1 20030730; DE 69909888 D1 20030904; DE 69909888 T2 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160526

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909888

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909888 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-05-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CLEANING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INKJET PRINTING HEAD

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI