Global Patent Index - EP 0960794 A3

EP 0960794 A3 2000-09-13 - Vehicle roof, especially roof without arches for rail-bound mass transit vehicles

Title (en)

Vehicle roof, especially roof without arches for rail-bound mass transit vehicles

Title (de)

Fahrzeugdach, insbesondere spiegelfreies Dach für schienengebundene Nahverkehrsfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Toit de véhicule, notamment toit sans cintres pour véhicules de transport en commun roulants sur rails

Publication

EP 0960794 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109651 A

Priority

DE 19823863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960794A2] The vehicle roof (1) has compartment-type reception and connecting elements (2), which in their structural height extend from the vehicle inner ceiling (11) to reach the roof skin (3), and are fitted-hinged at-on the side walls (8) of the vehicle. The reception and connecting elements are provided at both sides on connecting side walls with vertical opposing section elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960794 A2 19991201; EP 0960794 A3 20000913; DE 19823863 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI