Global patent index - EP 0960808 A3

EP 0960808 A3 2000-09-20 - Drive system for motorcycles

Title (en)

Drive system for motorcycles

Title (de)

Antriebssystem für Motorräder

Title (fr)

Système d'entraînement pour motocyclettes

Publication

EP 0960808 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99110513 A

Priority

JP 16619598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960808A2] A drive system for a motorcycle comprising a body frame (5), an engine (4) having a crankcase (4h) fixed to that body frame (5), and a supporting means (8) for a rear wheel (10), said supporting means (8) being attached to the engine (4), wherein said supporting means (8) is a rear arm (8), that a primary transmission (4c) being provided in said crankcase (4h) of said engine (4), and that a secondary transmission (60) being provided in said rear arm (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62M 7/12; B62K 11/04; B62K 25/28; B62M 7/02; B62M 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 17/04 (2006.01); B62K 11/04 (2006.01); B62K 25/28 (2006.01); B62M 7/02 (2006.01); B62M 7/06 (2006.01); B62M 9/08 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62K 11/04 (2013.01); B62K 25/283 (2013.01); B62M 7/02 (2013.01); F02B 61/02 (2013.01); B62K 2202/00 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960808 A2 19991201; EP 0960808 A3 20000920; CN 1117006 C 20030806; CN 1240740 A 20000112; JP 4266245 B2 20090520; JP H11342754 A 19991214; TW 431976 B 20010501

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060802

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 62M 7/12 A, 7B 62M 7/02 B, 7B 62M 7/04 B, 7B 62K 11/04 B, 7B 62K 25/28 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI