Global patent index - EP 0960962 A3

EP 0960962 A3 2000-08-09 - Method and device for oiling fibres before spinning

Title (en)

Method and device for oiling fibres before spinning

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Avivierung von Fasern vor einem Verspinnen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'ensimage des fibres avant la filature

Publication

EP 0960962 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104691 A

Priority

DE 19817418 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817418A1] Finish is applied before spinning but after the fibers have been parallelized and formed into a strand, especially after carding and before the sliver is placed in a can. Independent claims are included for the following (a) a finish applicator placed between card and spinning machine (b) a card fitted with a finish applicator (c) a drawframe fitted with a finish applicator (d) a lap former with a finish applicator (e) a comber with a finish applicator (f) a roving frame with a finish applicator (g) a spinning machine with a finish applicator (h) finish applicators with a strand inlet (21) and outlet (22) corresponding to the strand size and placed in line with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 29/00; D01H 13/30; D06B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 99/00 (2010.01); D01H 13/30 (2006.01); D06B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 99/005 (2013.01); D01H 13/306 (2013.01); D06B 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817418 A1 19991021; EP 0960962 A2 19991201; EP 0960962 A3 20000809

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01G 29/00 A, 7D 01H 13/30 B, 7D 06B 1/02 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI