Global Patent Index - EP 0960966 A3

EP 0960966 A3 2000-07-12 - Method and apparatus for simultaneously feeding at least two yarns in double-cylinder circular knitting machines

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for simultaneously feeding at least two yarns in double-cylinder circular knitting machines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum gleichzeitigen Zuführen von mindestens zwei Fäden an Doppeltzylinder-Rundstrickmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'alimentation simultané d'au moins deux fils dans des machines à tricoter circulaires à deux cylindres

Publication

EP 0960966 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109216 A

Priority

IT MI981178 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960966A2] A method and an apparatus for simultaneously feeding at least two yarns in double-cylinder circular knitting machines. The method comprises a step for feeding the needles (20) of the machine, by way of a yarn finger unit (1) having at least two dispensing points (10,15) for at least two yarns (4,5), with at least two yarns, with yarn dispensing points (10,15) located at substantially mutually identical vertical elevations; and a step for taking up the excess portion of the two yarns (4,5) at the end of the engagement of the yarns by the needles (20) of the machine. At the end of the feeding step and before the beginning of the take-up step, the yarn dispensing point (10) of one (5) of the two yarns is vertically staggered with respect to the dispensing point (15) of the other yarn (4) in order to vertically space one of the yarns (5) with respect to the other (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 9/10 (2006.01); D04B 9/46 (2006.01); D04B 15/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960966 A2 19991201; EP 0960966 A3 20000712; EP 0960966 B1 20030502; DE 69907318 D1 20030605; DE 69907318 T2 20040429; IT MI981178 A1 19991129; JP H11350315 A 19991221; KR 100580435 B1 20060515; KR 19990088550 A 19991227

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080521

2009-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080521

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060414

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LONATI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907318

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LONATI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI