Global Patent Index - EP 0960977 A3

EP 0960977 A3 2000-08-30 - Endless belt

Title (en)

Endless belt

Title (de)

Endloses Band

Title (fr)

Bande sans fin

Publication

EP 0960977 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101932 A

Priority

DE 19823948 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960977A2] The continuous belt (10), at the assembly to carry a wet pulp to be dried into a web, has one side (12) which is generally closed and one side (14) which is mainly open to give a water storage capacity of at least 5 l/m<2> and especially 5-25 l/m<2> and preferably 10-18 l/m<2>. The mean bending strength of the belt, in the peripheral and the lateral directions, has a value 10 Nm<2> for a width of 1 m. The mean bending strength in the peripheral direction is equal to the mean lateral bending strength, or they may differ. The open side (14) of the belt has grooves, at least partially extending all together in the peripheral direction, together with grooves all together in the lateral direction. The grooves can also be in a spiral. At least part of the grooves have a depth of 5-25 mm and especially 12-20 mm. The open side (14) of the belt can alternatively be fitted with knobs (20), in longitudinal and lateral rows, or in a spiral. The outer surfaces (24) of the knobs (20), in contact with the fourdrinier, are 50% of the total belt (10) surface, and cover especially 15-30% and preferably 20-25%. The knob contact surfaces (24) do not extend by more than 6 mm in any direction, with a maximum surface side size of about 2 mm. The knob contact surfaces (24) have a round, quadratic or rectangular shape. The projecting knobs (20) have a compressibility of 100-2000 kPa. The belt (10) has a reinforcement (26) to support the projecting knobs (20), using reinforcement filaments aligned longitudinally and laterally, embedded in a base matrix (18). The base matrix (18) is molded with surplus material, to allow the knobs (20) to be cut out. The base (18) has a thickness (hB) of 0.5-8.0 mm and preferably about 4.0 mm. The knobs (20) contain an inner gas, and preferably an air cushion, with ventilation especially to the side and/or to the inner side (12) of the belt. The knob contact surfaces (24) can also be formed by spikes, inserted into the knobs (20). The spikes are slitted at least at the contact surfaces (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00; D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/10 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/029 (2013.01); D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4411621 A1 19951005 - VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960977 A2 19991201; EP 0960977 A3 20000830; EP 0960977 B1 20031203; AT 255656 T 20031215; CA 2272727 A1 19991128; DE 19823948 A1 19991202; JP H11350370 A 19991221; US 6173831 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-09-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070130

2007-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-01-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-03-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907912 P 20040115

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI