Global patent index - EP 0960981 A3

EP 0960981 A3 2000-07-19 - Mobile working apparatus and assembling set for an operating arm for a mobile working apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile working apparatus and assembling set for an operating arm for a mobile working apparatus

Title (de)

Mobiles Arbeitsgerät und Bausatz für einen Arbeitsarm für ein mobiles Arbeitsgerät

Title (fr)

Engin mobile de travail et kit d'assemblage pour un bras de travail pour un engin mobile de travail

Publication

EP 0960981 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106190 A

Priority

DE 19824282 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960981A2] A mobile, self propelled demolition machine has a telescopic arm (10) with a cutting head eg. cutting shears. The range of operation of the machine is enhanced by mounting the cutting head on a pivot mounted extension to reach into the structure to be broken up. The telescopic arm is fitted to the machine via adapters and the whole system is operated by hydraulics. Different attachments can be fitted eg. excavator buckets for excavating under ground level. For close up work the arm is retracted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/38; E02F 3/30; E02F 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/30 (2006.01); E02F 3/38 (2006.01); E02F 3/39 (2006.01); E02F 3/96 (2006.01); E02F 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/965 (2013.01); E02F 3/304 (2013.01); E02F 3/306 (2013.01); E02F 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960981 A2 19991201; EP 0960981 A3 20000719; DE 19824282 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010120

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 02F 3/38 A, 7E 02F 3/96 B, 7E 02F 3/30 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI