Global Patent Index - EP 0960984 A3

EP 0960984 A3 2000-04-26 - Dispensing device

Title (en)

Dispensing device

Title (de)

Abgabevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif distributeur

Publication

EP 0960984 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109158 A

Priority

DE 19823338 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960984A2] Device for dispensing a solid, gel, paste or liquid medium in liquid or aqueous form in a toilet bowl comprises a container that can be filled with flush water, is equipped with a holder for attachment to the rim of the toilet bowl and is divided into at least two compartments, each having a container for a different medium. The compartments each contain a dispensing tube with a liquid inlet end surrounded by a cover and an outlet end from which liquid can flow through the bottom of the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960984 A2 19991201; EP 0960984 A3 20000426; DE 19823338 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUCK-CHEMIE GMBH .

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IE LI NL PT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IE LI NL PT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI