Global Patent Index - EP 0960985 A3

EP 0960985 A3 2000-11-15 - I-section girder for building constructions

Title (en)

I-section girder for building constructions

Title (de)

I-förmiger Träger für Gebäudekonstruktionen

Title (fr)

Poutrelle en I pour constructions en bâtiment

Publication

EP 0960985 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104353 A

Priority

DE 19824063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960985A2] A profiled beam for construction has an I-cross section and with double headed end profiles each with an entry slot (14) and with hooked ends (20). The width (B1) of each end hook is equal to the internal spacing (H1) in the hooked ends. This enables two similar profiled ends to be linked at right angles to each other eg. to form cross walls or to form corners. No additional brackets/adapters are required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04C 3/06; E04C 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16S 3/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04C 3/06 (2006.01); E04C 3/32 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/32 (2013.01); E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04C 3/06 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0434 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960985 A2 19991201; EP 0960985 A3 20001115; CA 2273139 A1 19991129; DE 19824063 A1 19991202; JP H11351496 A 19991224

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/24 A, 7E 04C 3/06 B, 7E 04C 3/32 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI