Global Patent Index - EP 0960994 A3

EP 0960994 A3 2002-09-04 - Locking device, in particular for a vehicle

Title (en)

Locking device, in particular for a vehicle

Title (de)

Schliesseinrichtung, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage, en particulier pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 0960994 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108835 A

Priority

  • DE 19823345 A
  • DE 19917789 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960994A2] The closing unit has at least one adjusting drive, namely an electric motor (1), controlling the adjusting of the functions of the closing unit, in conjunction with a transmission element with inner and outer cam contours, also first and second layers (10,12). A potentiometer (19) is provided with slider, connected with the adjusting motor or at least one transmission element (4), for determining continuous movement as well as the functional settings of the adjustment drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/22; E05B 47/00; E05B 65/12; E05B 65/19; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/42 (2013.01); E05B 81/64 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/25 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5743 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960994 A2 19991201; EP 0960994 A3 20020904; US 6304003 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030607

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 17/22 A, 7E 05B 47/00 B, 7E 05B 65/20 B, 7E 05B 65/19 B, 7E 05B 65/12 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI