Global Patent Index - EP 0960997 A3

EP 0960997 A3 2002-09-18 - Connecting piece for the driving rod of a closure device for curved windows

Title (en)

Connecting piece for the driving rod of a closure device for curved windows

Title (de)

Verbindungselement für Treibstangen einer Schliesseinrichtung für Rundbogenfenster

Title (fr)

Elément de connection pour tringles d'un dispositif de fermeture pour une fenêtre en arc

Publication

EP 0960997 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109125 A

Priority

DE 19823607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0960997A2] The linkage for the movement of a curved window, in a window or door, has a connecting piece (1) of a bend-resistant material, in a curve over its whole length. It is located under the drive rod (13) in a free zone (9) of the fitting groove (8). It has a cross section slightly smaller than the cross section of the free zone (9) of the fitting groove (8). The curvature of the connecting piece (1) has a radius (10) matching the fitting groove (8) of a curved window. The connecting piece is of plastics or metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/20; E05C 9/06; E05F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 7/08 (2013.01); E05C 9/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0960997 A2 19991201; EP 0960997 A3 20020918; EP 0960997 B1 20050720; AT 299981 T 20050815; DE 19823607 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070508

2006-07-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912288 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05C 9/20 A, 7E 05C 9/06 B, 7E 05F 7/08 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI