Global patent index - EP 0961016 A3

EP 0961016 A3 2000-09-20 - Internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0961016 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99600006 A

Priority

GR 98100191 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961016A2] It is a thermal engine that can be placed on any vehicle, it is piston-bearing, retrogressive, four-stroke, four-cylinder, over-quadrangular and uses gasoline as principal combustible. It accepts lubrication and is water cooled. Finally, it produces work with the cylinders only in level disposition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/24 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/243 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961016 A2 19991201; EP 0961016 A3 20000920; GR 980100191 A 20000131

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02B 75/24 A, 7F 01B 1/08 B, 7F 01B 9/04 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI