EP 0961025 A1 19991201 - Fuel injection nozzle
Title (en)
Fuel injection nozzle
Title (de)
Brennstoffeinspritzdüse
Title (fr)
Buse d'injection de combustible
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 98810500 A 19980529
Abstract (en)
The fuel injection jet (1), for a diesel motor, has a jet body (2) with a jet head (3) with a longitudinal drilling (32). The drilling (32) ends in at least one jet opening (31), for the delivery of the fuel into the combustion zone. A jet needle (7) is within the jet body (2), in the drilling (32), with its tip (73) at a valve seat (6) to open and close the passage to the jet opening. The jet head (3) is in a release mounting at the jet body (2). The jet head (3) is of a ceramic material.
Abstract (de)
Eine Brennstoffeinspritzdüse (1) für einen Dieselmotor, insbesondere einen Zweitakt-Grossdieselmotor umfasst einen Düsenkörper (2) und einen mit dem Düsenkörper (2) verbundenen Düsenkopf (3), der mit einer Längsbohrung (32) versehen ist, und der mindestens ein von der Längsbohrung (32) ausgehendes Düsenloch (31) aufweist, durch das der Brennstoff in einen Verbrennungsraum austreten kann sowie eine im Innern des Düsenkörpers (2) angeordneten Düsennadel (7), die sich bis in die Längsbohrung (32) des Düsenkopfs (3) erstreckt und deren Ende (73) mit einem im Düsenkopf (3) vorgesehenen Ventilsitz (6,6a) derart zusammenwirkt, dass es am Ventilsitz (6) den Durchlass zu dem Düsenloch (31) öffnet oder verschliesst. Der Düsenkopf (3) ist abnehmbar mit dem Düsenkörper (2) verbunden. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F02M 53/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
F02M 53/043 (2013.01 - EP); F02M 61/166 (2013.01 - EP); F02M 61/18 (2013.01 - EP KR); F02B 3/06 (2013.01 - EP); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] GB 755316 A 19560822 - BURMEISTER & WAINS MOT MASK
- [X] CH 285899 A 19520930 - DUREX S A [CH]
- [X] WO 9213189 A1 19920806 - KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]
- [A] US 5271563 A 19931221 - CERNY MARK S [US], et al
- [A] FR 1082680 A 19541231 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 190 (M - 704) 3 June 1988 (1988-06-03)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 343 (M - 1285) 24 July 1992 (1992-07-24)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 261 (M - 257) 19 November 1983 (1983-11-19)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE DK IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0961025 A1 19991201; JP 2000064930 A 20000303; KR 19990088618 A 19991227; PL 333388 A1 19991206
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 98810500 A 19980529; JP 7525399 A 19990319; KR 19990019352 A 19990528; PL 33338899 A 19990526