Global Patent Index - EP 0961036 A3

EP 0961036 A3 2001-12-19 - Actuation cylinder

Title (en)

Actuation cylinder

Title (de)

Arbeitszylinder

Title (fr)

Vérin

Publication

EP 0961036 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890157 A

Priority

AT 92098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961036A2] The working cylinder, using pressure to operate a piston, is a cylindrical tube (1) with end pieces (2,3) with an inner sliding piston (5) operated by pressure. The piston rod (6) extends through the cylinder housing, to operate linked components. A spring is fitted at the piston or piston rod and one end piece. The piston rod (6) is a hollow tube, to take at least part of the spring (7) axially within it, and be secured to the facing end piece (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/1476 (2013.01); F15B 15/1457 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961036 A2 19991201; EP 0961036 A3 20011219; EP 0961036 B1 20031029; AT 406600 B 20000626; AT A92098 A 19991115; DE 59907503 D1 20031204; ES 2211024 T3 20040701; HU 222216 B1 20030528; HU 9901763 A2 20000428; HU 9901763 A3 20020228; HU 9901763 D0 19990728; PT 961036 E 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYGRAMA A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050520

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYGRAMA A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-05-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211024 T3

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040507

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907503 P 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB PT

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYGRAMA AG

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB PT

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYGRAMA AG

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB PT

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI