Global Patent Index - EP 0961078 A3

EP 0961078 A3 2001-05-30 - Recessed lighting fixture

Title (en)

Recessed lighting fixture

Title (de)

Einbauleuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire encastré

Publication

EP 0961078 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106816 A

Priority

DE 29809630 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961078A2] The installation (2) has a housing (3) which is built to receive at least one light (4) and a reflector unit (5,6). The installation is fixable in an opening with the aid of attachment elements in the form of attachment springs (10). The springs are located on the housing so as to have an overlap and are adjustable. The installation is pressed into the opening after attachment of the electrical connections. The attachment springs are located in the region of the side surfaces of the housing, and they are adjustable from an attachment position, in which they extend beyond the edge region of the floor, against a pretension inwards in an installed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/04; F21V 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/00 (2013.01); F21S 8/02 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809630 U1 19980917; EP 0961078 A2 19991201; EP 0961078 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 21/04 A, 7F 21V 23/06 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI