Global Patent Index - EP 0961089 A3

EP 0961089 A3 2002-09-04 - Central heating boiler

Title (en)

Central heating boiler

Title (de)

Zentralheizungskessel

Title (fr)

Chaudière de chauffage central

Publication

EP 0961089 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99660083 A

Priority

FI 981204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961089A2] The invention relates to a central heating boiler, comprising a fumace (11) whose inlet (11a) is fitted with an oil or gas burner (12) and whose rear section is provided with an outlet (11b) for flue gases, a water space (10) encircling the fumace, through which is extended a heating water circulation (14, 15), as well as at least one heat exchanger for heating warm service water. The heat exchanger comprises a flattish container (3) located in the rear section of the furnace (11) and at a small distance from the rear wall of the fumace. The warm service water has its output (21) fitted with a thermostat (5) which is coupled to control said oil or gas bumer (12) on the basis of the service water temperature. In the boiler of the invention, the heat exchanger (3) is provided with an inlet pipe (31) whose end (32) opens into the interior of the heat exchanger (3) at a point substantially higher than an end (34) of its outlet pipe (33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/52; F24H 9/12; F28D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/52 (2006.01); F24H 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/52 (2013.01); F24H 1/285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] WO 9425806 A1 19941110 - UKKI HEATING OY [FI], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961089 A2 19991201; EP 0961089 A3 20020904; EP 0961089 B1 20051116; DE 69928324 D1 20051222; DE 69928324 T2 20060810; DK 0961089 T3 20060327; FI 103432 B1 19990630; FI 103432 B 19990630; FI 981204 A0 19980529; NO 992530 A 19991130; NO 992530 D0 19990526

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69928324

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140522

2015-01-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140531

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69928324

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-03-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-03-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928324 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040824

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 1/52 A, 7F 24H 9/12 B, 7F 28D 21/00 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI