Global patent index - EP 0961090 A3

EP 0961090 A3 2000-03-15 - Compound refrigerating installation and method for operating a compound refrigerating installation

Title (en)

Compound refrigerating installation and method for operating a compound refrigerating installation

Title (de)

Verbund(kälte)anlage und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Verbund(kälte)anlage

Title (fr)

Installation frigorifique combinée et procédé pour faire fonctionner une installation frigorifique combinée

Publication

EP 0961090 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108910 A

Priority

DE 19823525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961090A2] An oil equalizing line is designed in such a manner, that the lower edge of the connections provided at the compressor housings of the equalizing line, lie above the level of the minimum oil level of the compressor. At least one shutoff organ, a valve is arranged in the oil equalization line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 1/00; F04B 39/02; F25B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/02 (2006.01); F25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 31/002 (2013.01); F04B 39/0207 (2013.01); F25B 2400/075 (2013.01); F25B 2500/27 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961090 A2 19991201; EP 0961090 A3 20000315; EP 0961090 B1 20040929; AT 278164 T 20041015; DE 19823525 A1 19991202; ES 2229578 T3 20050416; PT 961090 E 20050228

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160129

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120506

2013-08-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120505

2012-09-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-08-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120726 AND 20120801

2012-07-06 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: CARRIER KAELTETECHNIK DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120626

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, FARMINGTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, FARMINGTON, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120518

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20120503

2012-05-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-05-18 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20120416

2012-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CARRIER CORPORATION, US

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120416

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110517

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-03-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDE KALTETECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-11-13 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2008-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2007-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050505

2005-05-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050505

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2229578

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041214

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050116

2004-12-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910625

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE KAELTETECHNIK GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 25B 1/00 A, 7F 04B 39/02 B, 7F 25B 31/00 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI