Global Patent Index - EP 0961099 A3

EP 0961099 A3 2000-08-23 - Igniting system for penetrator projectiles

Title (en)

Igniting system for penetrator projectiles

Title (de)

Zündeinrichtung für Penetratoren

Title (fr)

Système d'allumage pour projectiles à effet cinétique

Publication

EP 0961099 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110091 A

Priority

  • DE 19823795 A
  • DE 19854608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961099A2] The ignition device has acceleration force detectors and an evaluation circuit for processing the sensor signals. The signals are compared with threshold values and generates output signals if the thresholds are exceeded. Cyclically repeating measurement cycles starting after activation of the ignition device involve averaging the acceleration sensor (B) output signal in at least two time steps with mutually offset starting times, evaluating the mean values and logically combining the output parameters (2) of the evaluation process (S/D) depending on time and/or results to derive an ignition signal (Z). An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method for producing the arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961099 A2 19991201; EP 0961099 A3 20000823; EP 0961099 B1 20030319; ES 2190149 T3 20030716

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110523

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110523

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110522

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190149 T3

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904591 P 20030424

2003-04-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TDW GESELLSCHAFT FUER VERTEIDIGUNGSTECHNISCHE WIRK

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI