Global patent index - EP 0961254 A3

EP 0961254 A3 2000-06-28 - Gas explosion protection device

Title (en)

Gas explosion protection device

Title (de)

Gasexplosions-Schutzgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de protection contre les explosions de gaz

Publication

EP 0961254 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110354 A

Priority

DE 29809490 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961254A2] Device has a gas sensor (GS) for detection of inflammable gases, which when present set an alarm signal to danger state. A coder (EC) and associated sender sends a signal to a house network (NL) to which the device is connected. A remote decoder (DC) determines a position from the signal and a switch allows the electric power to be switched off to that part of the building.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 37/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G08B 17/117 (2006.01); G08B 25/06 (2006.01); G08B 29/00 (2006.01); G08C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 37/00 (2013.01); G06F 19/00 (2013.01); G08B 17/117 (2013.01); G08B 25/06 (2013.01); G08B 29/00 (2013.01); G08C 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809490 U1 19991007; EP 0961254 A2 19991201; EP 0961254 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI