Global Patent Index - EP 0961257 A3

EP 0961257 A3 2000-06-28 - Connector for display stand

Title (en)

Connector for display stand

Title (de)

Steckverbindung für einen Präsentationsständer

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour présentoir

Publication

EP 0961257 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810440 A

Priority

DE 29809663 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961257A2] The connection consists of a cylindrical sleeve (1) having an upper peripheral collar (10), a lower conical recess (12) and an outer threaded section (11). A nut (3) is screwed onto the threaded section in order to reduce the support structure between the collar and the nut. A vertical support is inserted into the sleeve via a conical end section (20). The conical recess is provided with deepened contours (13,21), and the end section is deepened in a complementary way in order to prevent unwanted rotational movement of the vertical support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/18; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0068 (2013.01); G09F 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809663 U1 19980730; EP 0961257 A2 19991201; EP 0961257 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-04-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI