Global Patent Index - EP 0961264 B1

EP 0961264 B1 2004-12-15 - Emitting/receiving device for the selection of a source coder and methods used therein

Title (en)

Emitting/receiving device for the selection of a source coder and methods used therein

Title (de)

Sende- und Empfangsvorrichtung zur Auswahl eines Quellenkodierers und Verfahren dazu

Title (fr)

Appareil d'émission/réception pour sélectionner un codeur de source et procédés mis en oeuvre dans un tel appareil

Publication

EP 0961264 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99201604 A

Priority

FR 9806616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961264A1] The system provides selection of compression method according to circumstances. The system for transmission and reception of digital signals includes a transmitter which receives an original speech signal and applies this to a number of source coding devices. Each of these compresses the speech signal and provides a compressed signal at a given output data rate, with a measurable distortion. A selector chooses one of the coders from the source coding devices. The selector is able to determine an estimate of the distortion of the compressed signal, and compare this value with reference values in order to determine the appropriate selection of coder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 7/30 (2006.01); G10L 19/18 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961264 A1 19991201; EP 0961264 B1 20041215; CN 1192656 C 20050309; CN 1237073 A 19991201; DE 69922582 D1 20050120; DE 69922582 T2 20051006; ES 2235431 T3 20050701; JP 2000091922 A 20000331; KR 100587431 B1 20060609; KR 19990088502 A 19991227; US 2002069075 A1 20020606; US 6499008 B2 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070522

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070522

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070521

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235431 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922582 P 20050120

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/14 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/14 A

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI