Global Patent Index - EP 0961302 A3

EP 0961302 A3 2000-04-19 - Electric coil, transformer, and electric motor having such coil

Title (en)

Electric coil, transformer, and electric motor having such coil

Title (de)

Elektrische Spule, Transformator, und Elektromotor mit solcher Spule

Title (fr)

Bobinage électique, transformateur et moteur électrique comportant un tel bobinage

Publication

EP 0961302 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99401186 A

Priority

FR 9806647 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961302A2] Coil winding comprises a coating made of a polymer matrix and at least one material having a nonlinear resistance that is a doped or non doped conducting polymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 5/06 (2006.01); H01B 1/20 (2006.01); H01B 7/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H02K 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/323 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2927 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2936 (2013.01); Y10T 428/294 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2947 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2958 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961302 A2 19991201; EP 0961302 A3 20000419; CA 2272832 A1 19991127; FR 2779268 A1 19991203; FR 2779268 B1 20000623; JP 2000030926 A 20000128; US 6287691 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXANS

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI