Global Patent Index - EP 0961305 A3

EP 0961305 A3 2000-09-27 - Rotary actuator for electrical or electronic devices

Title (en)

Rotary actuator for electrical or electronic devices

Title (de)

Drehsteller für elektrische oder elektronische Geräte

Title (fr)

Actuateur rotatif pour dispositifs électriques ou électroniques

Publication

EP 0961305 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108917 A

Priority

DE 19824149 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961305A2] The rotary setting knob has a rotary head (10) and a controlled ratchet device (15), with at least one releasable pivoted stop element (26,27) for selectively holding the rotary head in defined ratchet positions, corresponding to different functions or parameter settings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/08 (2006.01); G05G 5/03 (2006.01); H01H 19/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/03 (2013.01); G05G 1/08 (2013.01); H01H 19/11 (2013.01); H01H 2003/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961305 A2 19991201; EP 0961305 A3 20000927; DE 19824149 A1 19991202; US 6404354 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI