Global Patent Index - EP 0961358 A3

EP 0961358 A3 2001-05-16 - Terminal block and integrated motor housing cap and terminal block holder

Title (en)

Terminal block and integrated motor housing cap and terminal block holder

Title (de)

Steckerblock und integrierter Motorgehaüsedeckel und Steckerblockhalter

Title (fr)

Bloc de connexion et couvercle de boîtier de moteur intégré et support de bloc de connexion

Publication

EP 0961358 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99630020 A

Priority

US 8605398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0961358A2] A locating assembly comprising a terminal block (12) and a terminal block holder (14) locates electric terminals (46) of an electric device (16) mounted in the terminal block (12) relative to a housing section (20) of the electric device (16) and also covers an opening (32) in a casing (30) of the electric device (16). The block holder (14) holds the terminal block (12) in a position relative to the housing section (20) where the electric terminals (46) mounted on the terminal block (12) will project through an opening (26) provided for the terminals (46) in the housing section (20) when the housing section (20) is assembled to the electric device (16). The block holder (14) also covers an opening (32) in the casing (30) of the electric device (16) and protects wiring of the electric device (16) extending to the terminal block (12) from contacting edges (36) of a metal end cap of the device casing (30). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/46; H01R 9/16; H02K 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/16 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/16 (2013.01); H01R 13/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5015894 A 19910514 - CROW WILLIAM D [US], et al
  • [E] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 11 30 September 1999 (1999-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0961358 A2 19991201; EP 0961358 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/46 A, 7H 01R 9/16 B, 7H 02K 5/22 B

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI