Global patent index - EP 0961580 A4

EP 0961580 A4 2000-04-12 - BIOABSORBABLE HEMOSTATIC SEALING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

BIOABSORBABLE HEMOSTATIC SEALING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

RESORBIERBARE BLUTSTILL-VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

OBTURATEUR HEMOSTATIQUE BIOABSORBABLE

Publication

EP 0961580 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98902674 A

Priority

  • US 9801189 W
  • US 3588297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831287A1] This invention is a device (18) and method of closing an incision or puncture in a patient by inserting a closure device into the incision or puncture until the anchor member of the closure device is along the wall of the blood vessel (10), or target organ adjacent to the puncture so that the closure device does not significantly obstruct the flow of fluid through the blood vessel or target organ, and then positioning a collagen member (28) along the outer surface of the blood vessel or target organ. The precise positioning of the closure device in the incision or puncture is accomplished through the use of an anchor member (26) which is preferably integral with a rod member (22) wherein the anchor member is adapted to be positioned along the inner wall of the blood vessel or target organ of the patient, and the rod member extends through the puncture and receives the expandable collagen member thereon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/04; A61B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/12 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/0057 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00004 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00637 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00654 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00659 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00672 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831287 A1 19980723; AU 5927498 A 19980807; CA 2278243 A1 19980723; CA 2278243 C 20060613; EP 0961580 A1 19991208; EP 0961580 A4 20000412; JP 2002515797 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050128

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ST. JUDE MEDICAL PUERTO RICO B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61B 17/04 A, 7A 61B 17/00 B

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990811

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE