Global Patent Index - EP 0961793 A4

EP 0961793 A4 2000-09-06 - POLYMERS INCORPORATING PEPTIDES

Title (en)

POLYMERS INCORPORATING PEPTIDES

Title (de)

PEPTIDEN ENTHALTENDE POLYMERE

Title (fr)

POLYMERES DANS LESQUELS SONT INCORPORES DES PEPTIDES

Publication

EP 0961793 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98901884 A

Priority

  • AU 9800076 W
  • AU PO507197 A
  • CA 2217321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834968A1] The present invention provides polymers incorporating peptides. In a first embodiment the polymers comprise polymerised units of (1) CH2=CR4-CO-X-R1 and (2) CH2=CR3-CO-R2, and optionally one or more other monomers. In a second embodiment the present invention provides polymers formed from CH2=CR4-CO-X-R1 and optionally one or more other monomers. Where X is a spacer having a length equivalent to 1 to 30 single C-C bonds, R1 is a peptide, each R1 being the same or different and -COR2 is an ester or amide and derivatives thereof as herein defined. The invention further relates to methods producing the polymers and methods of inducing an immune response using the polymers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 220/56; A61K 39/08; A61K 39/085; A61K 39/09; A61K 39/145; A61K 39/385; A61K 39/44; A61K 47/48; C07K 17/08; C08F 20/56; C08F 20/58; C08F 20/60; C08F 120/60; C08F 220/58; C08F 220/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/08 (2006.01); A61K 39/085 (2006.01); A61K 39/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/145 (2006.01); A61K 39/385 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/16 (2006.01); C07K 14/11 (2006.01); C07K 14/315 (2006.01); C07K 16/10 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); C07K 17/08 (2006.01); C08F 220/26 (2006.01); C08F 220/34 (2006.01); C08F 220/54 (2006.01); C08F 222/32 (2006.01); C08F 246/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 47/646 (2017.08); C07K 14/315 (2013.01); C07K 16/1018 (2013.01); C07K 16/1275 (2013.01); C08F 246/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C12N 2760/16122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834968 A1 19980813; EP 0961793 A1 19991208; EP 0961793 A4 20000906; JP 2001513120 A 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2000-09-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JACKSON, DAVID, CHARLES

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: O'BRIEN-SIMPSON, NEIL, MARTIN

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BROWN, LORENA, ELIZABETH

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZENG, WIEGUANG

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EDE, NICHOLAS, JON

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRANDT, EVELYN, ROSEMARY DEP OF MICRO & IMMUNO.

2000-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GOOD, MICHAEL, FRANCIS

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990830

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE