Global patent index - EP 0962160 A3

EP 0962160 A3 2000-02-23 - Press stud

Title (en)

Press stud

Title (de)

Druckknopf

Title (fr)

Bouton pression

Publication

EP 0962160 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108147 A

Priority

DE 19824943 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962160A2] The fastener (D) consists of two pairs of elements (A, B) assembled of an outer (1, 2) and an inner part (3, 4). The elements (A, B) are designed in order to hold a soft watertight material (21) between them, which is pushed into a collar-like shape (33, 34) when each of the two parts (1, 2) (3, 4) is riveted together. For closing, a cylindrical segment (7) protruding from the part (B) joined to the upper area of the garment is inserted into a circular space (16) in the part (A) joined to the lower part and is held in position by a circular spring (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/0017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962160 A2 19991208; EP 0962160 A3 20000223; DE 19824943 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI