Global patent index - EP 0962172 A3

EP 0962172 A3 2000-09-27 - Modular system for display of items on either vertical or horizontal surfaces

Title (en)

Modular system for display of items on either vertical or horizontal surfaces

Title (de)

Modulares System zur Präsentation von Artikeln auf vertikalen oder horizontalen Flächen

Title (fr)

Système modulaire pour la présentation d'objets sur des surfaces verticales ou horizontales

Publication

EP 0962172 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99110740 A

Priority

IT NA980042 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962172A2] Described herein is a modular system for displaying items, consisting of at least one basic module (1) comprising at least one panel (2) providing for a number of through holes (3) equal to one another, and a number of cylindrical bars (4) designed to be slotted into the through holes (3) of the panel (2); the panel with holes (2) and the bars (4) are (preferably) made of transparent material. In one possible embodiment, the bars (4) are inserted into the through holes (3) on both sides of the panel (2). The basic module (1) can further comprise an additional panel, combined with the transparent panel (2) with holes, which is made of transparent material or presents a mirror surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/0815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962172 A2 19991208; EP 0962172 A3 20000927; IT NA980042 A1 19991206; IT NA980042 D0 19980605

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI