Global Patent Index - EP 0962176 A3

EP 0962176 A3 2000-09-27 - Decoration accessory

Title (en)

Decoration accessory

Title (de)

Dekorationsaccessoire

Title (fr)

Accessoire de décoration

Publication

EP 0962176 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110525 A

Priority

DE 29810165 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962176A2] The accessory (1) has a motif carrier (2) exchangeably attached to a motif element (3). The carrier forms a slide in compartment which opens at the front. The compartment holds a bulbous-headed attachment element (7) on its rear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/00 (2006.01); A47H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/04 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01); A47H 23/00 (2013.01); A47H 2023/003 (2013.01); A47H 2201/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810165 U1 19991014; EP 0962176 A2 19991208; EP 0962176 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-08-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI