EP 0962266 A3 20020508 - Method of regulating the exit thickness of a rolled strip
Title (en)
Method of regulating the exit thickness of a rolled strip
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Regelung der Auslaufdicke eines gewalzten Bandes
Title (fr)
Procédé pour régler l'épaisseur de sortie d'une bande laminée
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19825121 A 19980605
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0962266A2] The method for regulating the exit thickness of a rolled strip after at least one roll stand, with the deviation from the strip target thickness used as a controller of an adjustment variable, is characterized by the fact that the coefficient of friction between the roll stand and the strip is used as an adjustment variable.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B21B 37/16 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B21B 37/16 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 08 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 119 (M - 1225) 25 March 1992 (1992-03-25)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0962266 A2 19991208; EP 0962266 A3 20020508; EP 0962266 B1 20040225; AT E260150 T1 20040315; DE 19825121 A1 19991209; DE 59908616 D1 20040401
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99110932 A 19990604; AT 99110932 T 19990604; DE 19825121 A 19980605; DE 59908616 T 19990604