Global Patent Index - EP 0962307 A3

EP 0962307 A3 2001-12-12 - Device and procedure for manufacturing and stacking plastic bags

Title (en)

Device and procedure for manufacturing and stacking plastic bags

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen und Verpacken von Folienbeuteln

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la fabrication et empiler des sachets en plastique

Publication

EP 0962307 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108243 A

Priority

DE 19825065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962307A2] The sheet material (4,6,8) is conveyed by at least two feeders (12,14,18,10,46), and is joined by a joining appliance (20) in the form of a welding appliance so that the joins extend across the feeder direction (54) over the width of material. A cutter (32) has a vertically movable cutter blade (34) cutting the joined sheets (22) along the joins into separate bags. A conveyor (26) feeds the joined sheets to the cutter. The cut-off bags (42) are stacked in a holder (40) by means of a delivery appliance (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/98; B31B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/62 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01); B31B 19/98 (2006.01); B31B 29/00 (2006.01); B31B 37/00 (2006.01); B31B 37/14 (2006.01); B31B 37/60 (2006.01); B65B 41/12 (2006.01); B65B 41/16 (2006.01); B65B 43/04 (2006.01); B65B 43/06 (2006.01); B65B 51/00 (2006.01); B65H 16/00 (2006.01); B65H 18/00 (2006.01); B65H 23/00 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01); B65H 35/06 (2006.01); B65H 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 50/18 (2017.08); B31B 70/98 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 2160/20 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962307 A2 19991208; EP 0962307 A3 20011212; EP 0962307 B1 20040714; AT 270959 T 20040715; BG 103451 A 20000131; BG 64225 B1 20040630; BR 9902819 A 20000711; CA 2273415 A1 19991204; CA 2273415 C 20020423; CN 1106929 C 20030430; CN 1243783 A 20000209; CZ 295113 B6 20050518; CZ 9901938 A3 19991215; DE 19825065 A1 19991216; DE 59909935 D1 20040819; DK 0962307 T3 20040927; ES 2221721 T3 20050101; HK 1025286 A1 20030829; HR P990160 A2 20000430; HU 9901833 A2 20000628; HU 9901833 A3 20011029; HU 9901833 D0 19990830; ID 22732 A 19991209; JP 2000015721 A 20000118; JP 3440466 B2 20030825; KR 100371873 B1 20030211; KR 20000005851 A 20000125; PL 190063 B1 20051031; PL 333519 A1 19991206; PT 962307 E 20041029; RU 2167767 C2 20010527; SA 1142 B1 20060820; SI 0962307 T1 20041031; SK 73799 A3 19991210; TR 199901256 A2 20000121; TR 199901256 A3 20000121; TW 470701 B 20020101; UA 61088 C2 20010315; US 6379291 B1 20020430; YU 24599 A 20010307; ZA 9903718 B 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101027

2011-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20101203

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2011-01-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-12-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-11-05 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101027

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INDAG G.- FUR INDUSTRIEBEDARF M.B.H. & CO. BETRIE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2005-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221721 T3

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402808

2004-09-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909935 P 20040819

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20011212;LT PAYMENT 20011212;LV PAYMENT 20011212;MK PAYMENT 20011212;RO PAYMENT 20011212;SI PAYMENT 20011212

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI