Global Patent Index - EP 0962309 A3

EP 0962309 A3 2001-12-12 - Bag making machine and method for manufacturing bags

Title (en)

Bag making machine and method for manufacturing bags

Title (de)

Beutelherstellungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Folienbeutel

Title (fr)

Machine de fabrication de sacs et procédé pour la fabrication de sacs

Publication

EP 0962309 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107472 A

Priority

DE 19824797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962309A2] The arrangement transports at least two foils (4,6) that are used as sides of the bag. The foils are laid one on the other and joined at the edges of bag. Joined foils are cut along joints to form individual foil bags. Any differences in the foil material are compensated for by stretching the foil with a smaller length for a bag. A measurement arrangement for detecting the quantity of transported foil material contains a number of optical sensors (38,39) of foil markings. An Independent claim is also included for a foil bag production method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 37/02; B31B 19/10; B31B 37/00; B65H 23/188

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/00 (2006.01); B31B 1/10 (2006.01); B31B 19/10 (2006.01); B31B 29/00 (2006.01); B31B 37/00 (2006.01); B65B 41/00 (2006.01); B65H 39/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 70/10 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2155/002 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 2160/20 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962309 A2 19991208; EP 0962309 A3 20011212; EP 0962309 B1 20070307; AT 355964 T 20070315; BG 103450 A 19991230; BR 9902931 A 20000321; CA 2273419 A1 19991203; CA 2273419 C 20020212; CN 1130299 C 20031210; CN 1244482 A 20000216; CZ 299289 B6 20080604; CZ 9901922 A3 19991215; DE 19824797 A1 19991209; DE 19824797 B4 20040212; DE 59914231 D1 20070419; DK 0962309 T3 20070611; ES 2284224 T3 20071101; HK 1024454 A1 20040423; HR P990162 A2 20000430; HU 9901832 A2 20000628; HU 9901832 A3 20010129; HU 9901832 D0 19990830; ID 22670 A 19991202; JP 2000016417 A 20000118; JP 3383938 B2 20030310; KR 100341383 B1 20020621; KR 20000005850 A 20000125; PL 190064 B1 20051031; PL 333521 A1 19991206; PT 962309 E 20070430; RU 2167765 C2 20010527; SA 1036 B1 20060730; SI 0962309 T1 20070831; SK 73499 A3 19991210; TR 199901246 A2 19991221; TR 199901246 A3 19991221; TW 470700 B 20020101; US 6267714 B1 20010731; YU 24499 A 20010528; ZA 9903719 B 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2018-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170429

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59914231

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0037020000

- IPC: B31B0070020000

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-12-27 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2010-11-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2284224 T3

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401485

2007-06-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070409

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914231 P 20070419

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2007-03-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070307

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020125;LT PAYMENT 20020125;LV PAYMENT 20020125;MK PAYMENT 20020125;RO PAYMENT 20020125;SI PAYMENT 20020125

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 37/02 A, 7B 31B 19/10 B, 7B 31B 37/00 B, 7B 65H 23/188 B

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI