Global Patent Index - EP 0962317 B1

EP 0962317 B1 2001-12-19 - Control for a ductor-type inking system

Title (en)

Control for a ductor-type inking system

Title (de)

Steuerung für ein Heberfarbwerk

Title (fr)

Commande pour un système d'encrage à preneur

Publication

EP 0962317 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109470 A

Priority

DE 29809948 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962317A1] An ink duct (2) is driven by means of a motor (3) with drive-control (4) with a pre-set rotational speed independent of the printing speed. The combined inking roller (5.1) after a vibrator roller (5) is controlled by a drive mechanism with vibrator control (13) to which signals dependent on the printing speed are transmitted. A control (16)to which signals dependent on printing speed are transmitted is connected to the vibrator control and the drive control. The control is connected to the main drive (15) of the printer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/13; B41F 31/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809948 U1 19980806; AT 211067 T 20020115; EP 0962317 A1 19991208; EP 0962317 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900574

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59900574

- Effective date: 20120510

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900574 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211067 T 20020115

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991021

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI