Global Patent Index - EP 0962332 A4

EP 0962332 A4 2000-03-01 - BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FILM FOR THERMAL TRANSFER

Title (en)

BIAXIALLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FILM FOR THERMAL TRANSFER

Title (de)

BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTE POLYESTERFOLIE FÜR THERMISCHE ÜBERTRAGUNGSDRUCKVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

FILM POLYESTER A ORIENTATION BIAXIALE POUR TRANSFERT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0962332 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98957128 A

Priority

  • JP 9805431 W
  • JP 33151097 A
  • JP 622898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928133A1] A biaxially oriented polyester film for thermal transfer which is a coated film having a thickness of 20 mu m or smaller and obtained by applying a coating fluid containing a water-soluble or water-dispersible organic polymer to at least one side of a polyester film whose orientation and crystallization have not been completed and then drying, stretching, and heating the film, characterized by having thickness fluctuations of 10 % or smaller in any 15 m range in the machine direction. When an ink ribbon containing this film as a base is used in printing, prints having reduced image density fluctuation can be obtained with satisfactory color tone reproducibility.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40; C08J 5/18; C08J 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928133 A1 19990610; DE 69813520 D1 20030522; DE 69813520 T2 20040226; EP 0962332 A1 19991208; EP 0962332 A4 20000301; EP 0962332 B1 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-17 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20160411

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69813520

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.

2004-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-11-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813520 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT LU NL

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT LU NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41M 5/40 A, 7C 08J 7/04 B, 7C 08J 5/18 B

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT LU NL