Global Patent Index - EP 0962350 A3

EP 0962350 A3 2001-02-28 - Device for changing the displacement characteristic of an engine throttle and accelerator pedal

Title (en)

Device for changing the displacement characteristic of an engine throttle and accelerator pedal

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Betätigungscharakteristik eines Leistungssteuerorgans

Title (fr)

Appareil pour modifier la caractéristique de déplacement d'un papillon moteur et d'une pédale d'accélérateur

Publication

EP 0962350 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108750 A

Priority

DE 19825306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962350A2] The arrangement has a driver's demand specification unit (3) forming a first control element, whose actuation characteristic can be varied depending on the actuation of a selection control element as a ratio of the actuation force (F) to the actuation displacement (PW) of the driver's demand specification unit. The characteristic can be varied depending on the output of a selection unit (2) for current operating mode, e.g. four-wheel drive. The driver's demand specification unit can be actuated by a sensor on the accelerator pedal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 26/02; F02D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962350 A2 19991208; EP 0962350 A3 20010228; DE 19825306 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI