Global Patent Index - EP 0962564 B1

EP 0962564 B1 2001-12-19 - Method for controlling a sectional warper and sectional warper

Title (en)

Method for controlling a sectional warper and sectional warper

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steuern einer Schärmaschine und Schärmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un ourdissoir sectionnel et ourdissoir sectionnel

Publication

EP 0962564 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108477 A

Priority

DE 19824896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962564A1] The warping operation at a warping machine, and especially a cone warping machine (12), marks a broken warp (11) when winding on to the warping drum (6), leaving the broken warp wound round it. On rewinding, the entire width (15) of the wound warps (11) on the warp beam is monitored by a sensor. On detection of the marking, a signal is generated and the rewinding action is stopped. The stop signal is generated when the warp break is not covered by wound warps as it passes through the sensor field, or when the warp break is covered by a given number of wound warp layers over it. The warping machine (5) slows to a stop when the sensor signal is received. The wound warps are reversed at the warping drum (6) until the broken warp is exposed for repair. Or, on receipt of the stop signal, the warping machine (5) is switched into a creeping movement, and then stopped automatically when the marked warp is fully exposed on the wound drum. Each yarn break is stored in a computer (7) on a stoppage, and the warp length to the break is computed. On rewinding, an alert signal is generated before coming to the warp break to convert the rewinding into a creeping action to be stopped when the marker is in a position to activate the sensor. An Independent claim is included for a warping assembly with a sensor which monitors the whole wound width (15) to detect the marker to show a break in the warps (11), and generate a stop signal on registering a marker.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00; D02H 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 13/02 (2013.01); D02H 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962564 A1 19991208; EP 0962564 B1 20011219; DE 19824896 A1 19991209; DE 19824896 B4 20061123

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2006-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#KREFELDER STRASSE 690#D-41066 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900575 20020131

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000210

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI