Global Patent Index - EP 0962566 A3

EP 0962566 A3 2001-05-23 - Method for controlling weft releasing and stopping operation on yarn storage devices in looms

Title (en)

Method for controlling weft releasing and stopping operation on yarn storage devices in looms

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Überwachen des Schussfadenfreigabe- und Stoppvorganges an Vorspulgeräten für Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour contrôler l'opération de libération et d'arrêt du fil de trame sur les dispositifs de stockage de fil dans les métiers à tisser

Publication

EP 0962566 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109509 A

Priority

DE 19824613 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962566A2] To monitor the weft yarn release and stop actions, at a loom supply bobbin, during the electrical control of the stopper unit the functional efficiency of the bobbin assembly is established through the development of a known characteristic in the curve of the control current (l) over time (t) as a significant value. The absence of the characteristic is signaled, or a known time shift of it, in the control of the loom. The correct function of the weft release is monitored through a comparison of actual and nominal appearance time ( DELTA t1) of the characteristic and a deviating appearance time ( DELTA t1'). The correct yarn stop action is given by a position signal from the stopper. The stopper action is through a mechanical resetting of the stopper. On using a reverse lifting magnet for the stopper, the stroke movements are monitored selectively by the characteristic on releasing or stopping the weft yarn. A multiple deviation ( DELTA t1') from the nominal appearance time ( DELTA t1) is interpreted as wear, and an appropriate report is generated. An Independent claim is included for a loom weft bobbin feed system where, in addition to the characteristic (2), a characteristic is taken from the control current for the stopper to monitor the functional efficiency of the stopper. At least the characteristic to monitor the main blower jet valve and the stopper monitoring characteristic are checked in the loom control to test for a time coincidence. A fault signal for a display and/or to stop the loom is generated if at least one characteristic lies outside the time coincidence window. Preferred Features: The time of the coincidence, or the time coincidence window, matches a rotary angle or rotary angle range at the main shaft of the loom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/36 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/363 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962566 A2 19991208; EP 0962566 A3 20010523; EP 0962566 B1 20031029; DE 19824613 A1 19991209; JP H11350301 A 19991221; US 6176272 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100512

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LINDAUER DORNIER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060512

2005-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050404

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040206

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907506 P 20031204

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI