Global Patent Index - EP 0962591 A3

EP 0962591 A3 2000-10-18 - Roll, calender and method for operating a roll

Title (en)

Roll, calender and method for operating a roll

Title (de)

Walze, Kalander und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau, calandre et procédé pour le fonctionnement d' un rouleau

Publication

EP 0962591 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110246 A

Priority

DE 19824542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962591A2] The roller, especially for a paper calendar assembly, has a heating system (19-22) which sets a different temperature at the roller journal (7,8) zones from the temperature at the center of the roller (9) between the journals (7,8) with the elastic roller cladding (4) round the roller core (2). The heating system (19-22) is a flow path for a heating medium. A displacement body (10) in the roller (1) forms a ring zone (11) to the core (2). The core (2) has a number of drillings, equally distributed in the peripheral direction, and axially parallel. The temperature control unit (22) sets the temperature of the heat carrier medium according to the tensile loading and the roller temperature. The temperature difference in the medium, between the entry and exit at the roller, is max. 3 degrees C. A larger heat exchange surface (14) is at the roller journal zones (7,8) than the heating surfaces at the roller center (9). The heating medium flow speed is faster at the roller center (9) than at the journals (7,8). The heating system (19-22) cools the journal zones (7,8) from the interior, where they are not covered by the elastic cladding (4). The heating medium temperature is between the temps. at the journal (7,8) and center (9) zones. Each roller in the calendar assembly has its own heating system (19 - 22). An Independent claim is included for the roller operation, where the temperature pattern is set axially according to the ambient temperature and the tensile loading. Preferred Features: The roller journals and the center zone are heated. The roller journals can be cooled more strongly than the other roller zones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0233 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01); D21G 1/0286 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962591 A2 19991208; EP 0962591 A3 20001018; EP 0962591 B1 20040901; AT 275218 T 20040915; CA 2273448 A1 19991203; CA 2273448 C 20040316; DE 19824542 A1 19991230; DE 19824542 B4 20050714; US 6209451 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130527

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910375

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 275218 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060528

2005-09-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910375 P 20041007

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI