Global Patent Index - EP 0962619 A3

EP 0962619 A3 2001-04-11 - Fire resistant door provided with a glazing panel

Title (en)

Fire resistant door provided with a glazing panel

Title (de)

Brandschutztür mit einem verglasten Türblatt

Title (fr)

Porte coupe-feu avec vantail vitré

Publication

EP 0962619 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890097 A

Priority

AT 93598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962619A2] The frame enclosing the glass (4) consists of metal, U-shaped profiles (6) gripping round the glass edges (10). The side of the metal profiles facing away from the glass form a thrust arm (11) as an extension of one U-arm (8). The metal profiles have at least one holder (12,13,14) into which is inserted a corner piece (15,16,17) reinforcing the corners of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 3/964

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/964 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/164 (2013.01); E06B 3/5454 (2013.01); E06B 3/9648 (2013.01); E06B 5/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962619 A2 19991208; EP 0962619 A3 20010411; AT 406286 B 20000327; AT A93598 A 19990815

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI